Financial history HADDENHAM PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1019319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £89.34k £104.13k £113.94k £91.41k £162.51k
Total expenditure £90.33k £97.34k £106.33k £101.35k £136.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £72.67k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k N/A £14.11k N/A N/A