HAYES END COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To bring together various groups and peoples in the local area of Hayes, Middlesex with particular emphasis on helping housebound and disabled persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 31 March 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Dawn Bridgeman | Chair | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Webster | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Bridgeman | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Read | Trustee | 25 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATHY LITTLE | Trustee | 06 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.97k | £14.54k | £5.44k | £30.06k | £28.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.78k | £37.99k | £16.64k | £28.16k | £26.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.02k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2022
(These accounts |
30 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 01 September 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 30 November 2020 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH MARCH 1991
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HAYES END AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B)TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE, AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
HAYES END AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hayes End Community Association
Hayes End Community Park
Kingsway
Hayes
Middlesex
UB3 2TZ
- Phone:
- 02085737594
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window