FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S THAME

Charity number: 1019501
Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We hold fund raising events during the year including concerts and quiz nights. Also we receive donations from members of the public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022

Total income: £2,023
Total expenditure: £211

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 March 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LEOPOLD ANDREW WRIGHT Chair
None on record
TIMOTHY GABB Trustee 26 March 2012
None on record
SUE DEANEY Trustee 26 March 2012
None on record
HELENA MARY FICKLING Trustee 26 March 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £1.11k £3.66k £1.12k £218 £2.02k
Total expenditure £181 £7.75k £505 £209 £211
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 17 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o Haddenham Healthcare Limited
Unit 4 Drakes Farm
Drakes Drive,Long Crendon
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP18 9BA
Phone:
01844 208842
Website:

No information available