NEW LODGE PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
New Lodge Preschool offers preschool activities for children age 2 and over.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2021
Total income includes £49,827 from 9 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Wigan
Governance
- 31 March 1993: Standard registration
- PENSON STREET PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Hornby Mrs | Chair | 18 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Frodsham | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Gradwell | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.27k | £62.35k | £63.71k | £67.20k | £60.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.05k | £51.37k | £73.42k | £76.85k | £63.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £72.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £50.18k | £53.17k | £59.19k | £49.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 358 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 358 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 724 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 724 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 June 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 06 September 2021 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 June 2021 | 368 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 06 September 2021 | 463 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 NOVEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 13 NOVEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT ABD EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wigan Bowling Green Ltd
New Lodge
WIGAN
Lancashire
WN1 2ND
- Phone:
- 01942820857
- Email:
- newlodge.office@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window