POOLE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of Poole University of the Third Age (U3A) is the advancement of education, leisure time, and recreational activities of middle aged and older persons no longer in gainful employment, residing in Poole and the surrounding area. These objectives are achieved by the organising and running of educational and leisure courses, using rented venues and member's homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 31 March 1993: Standard registration
- POOLE U 3 A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Stuart Jowsey | Chair | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Harrison | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denise Marie Brown | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Margaret Palmer | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Bettess | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Thomas | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruaraidh Donald James MacKay | Trustee | 12 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.86k | £75.92k | £853 | £58.43k | £63.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.72k | £46.60k | £14.30k | £69.46k | £71.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED 14 FEBRUARY 1997, 11 FEBRUARY 2000, 15 FEBRUARY 2002 AND 24 OCTOBER 2003. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
POOLE, DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Spire
High Street
POOLE
Dorset
BH15 1DF
- Phone:
- 01202678113
- Email:
- pooleu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window