THE BARNES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ENGLISH SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The BCA English School carries on the teaching of English and of the British way of life to foreign students residing or staying within Barnes and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 March 1993: Standard registration
- 01 December 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 01 December 2014: Funds transferred to 1157867 THE BARNES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ENGLISH SCHOOL
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.02k | £73.71k | £90.27k | £106.20k | £115.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.53k | £71.07k | £89.15k | £103.92k | £113.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 11 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2014
(These accounts |
11 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 18 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | 25 November 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 18 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | 18 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 12 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | 12 December 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9TH FEBRUARY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING THE BARNES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ENGLISH SCHOOL BY TEACHING THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND THE ENGLISH WAY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
BARNES AND THE IMMEDIATE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window