Accounts and annual returns ITV TRUST

Charity number: 1019628
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 04 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 21 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 03 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 14 February 2007 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 14 February 2007 106 days late
Annual return 31 December 2004 26 January 2006 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 26 January 2006 87 days late