Financial history CLIPSTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1019665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £7.44k £13.68k £20.65k £13.85k £38.89k
Total expenditure £5.47k £5.81k £5.24k £13.06k £9.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.17k £13.06k £2.92k £3.25k