Accounts and annual returns JACK IN THE BOX PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1019666
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2012 12 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 12 December 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2011 15 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 08 November 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2010 13 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 17 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 02 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 02 February 2010 On Time