JACK IN THE BOX PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Childcare and early years education for children two to five years. Childcare in our out of school group for children five to eleven years - mainly of working parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Dudley
Governance
- 01 April 1993: Standard registration
- 21 December 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 21 December 2012: Funds transferred to 1149722 JACK IN THE BOX PRE-SCHOOL LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.52k | £88.65k | £113.90k | £113.24k | £132.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.39k | £88.58k | £101.58k | £99.26k | £159.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 12 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 12 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 15 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 08 November 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 13 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 17 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 02 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 02 February 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
TO ENHANC ETHE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window