Trustees NEWBRIDGE PREPARATORY SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity number: 1019682

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUY JONATHAN BIRKETT | Chair | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sara Maguire | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Victoria Watkins | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kirpal Kaur Bhambra | Trustee | 19 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAULA MARGARET TIMMINS | Trustee | 16 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARTHUR HOLLINGSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.