OPEN HANDS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST
Charity Number: 1019715
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2005
Total income: £12,350
Total expenditure: £10,896
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 April 1993: Standard registration
- 10 April 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- GREENMEADOW CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.82k | £12.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.13k | £10.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 12 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 12 June 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 12 July 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 12 July 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 MARCH 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMNET OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH RELIEF OF PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE SWINDON AND AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window