Financial history WESSEX COMMUNITY ACTION

Charity Number: 1019716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £218.88k £281.93k £344.69k £472.85k £413.43k
Total expenditure £299.73k £273.59k £318.46k £512.80k £406.93k
Income from government contracts £156.03k £192.77k £218.50k £276.95k £214.20k
Income from government grants £20.00k £37.63k £10.00k £12.32k £34.53k