CANCERBACKUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving cancer patients and those living with cancer up-to-date information, practical advice and support they need to reduce the fear and uncertainty of cancer. The charity's aim is to provide information in reply to any question on any cancer. Note that this is now undertaken in the name of Macmillan Cancer Support, with which Cancerbackup merged in 2008.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 April 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Ashman | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Matthew Butterworth | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 MARCH 1993 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 2 SEPTEMBER 1993, 25 SEPTEMBER 2002, 17 MARCH 2006 AND 1 MAY 2008 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF BY ANY AND EVERY CHARITABLE MEANS OF THE POVERTY DISTRESS AND/OR IGNORANCE OF THOSE WHO HAVE OR HAVE HAD OR ARE SUSPECTED OF HAVING CANCER AND OF THEIR FAMILIES AND FRIENDS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Macmillan Cancer Support
3rd Floor, Bronze Building
The Forge
London
SE1 9HZ
- Phone:
- 02078407840
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window