BRAIDWOOD SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Braidwood School raises money in order to enhance and extend learning beyond the classroom, ie. residential visits and day courses. In addition we provide BSL classes for professionals working with the Deaf and to families and carers of Deaf children. Transport, food and residential costs are provided by the school for those children whose families are in necessitous circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 06 April 1993: Standard registration
- BRAIDWOOD SCHOOL FUND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN SAYWOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mr P Bailey | Trustee | 25 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.19k | £28.73k | £1.37k | £2.68k | £4.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.99k | £1.41k | £919 | £4.15k | £4.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 July 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 March 2021 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 SEPTEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED 23 FEBRUARY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRAIDWOOD SCHOOL
BROMFORD ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B36 8AF
- Phone:
- 01214645558
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window