Trustees FRIENDS OF ST GEORGE'S CHURCH, BREDE
Charity number: 1019762
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
XXXX Margaret Sandra | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Marriott | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARY LOUISE HULL | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Wharton | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|||||
LYNNE GERALDINE BRAMLEY | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Sue Orchard | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BURCHETT | Trustee | 04 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CROOK | Trustee | 04 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA VALERIE WHATELY | Trustee | 28 May 2003 |
|
|
||||
WENDY BURCHETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.