DRYBROOK SURGERY EQUIPMENT FUND

Charity number: 1019769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purchase and maintenance of equipment for the benefit of persons attending Drybrook Surgery. Donate equipment to The Doctors, The local NHS Trust or individual patients. Arrange and support staff training. Circulate books, pamphlets, films etc. Raise funds and receive gifts, invest monies not immediately required.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 11 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £1,653

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 April 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katie Abigail Dyer Trustee 23 May 2024
None on record
TERRY JONES Trustee
None on record
JENNIFER EAST Trustee
RUSPIDGE MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/03/2020 11/03/2021 11/03/2022 11/03/2023 11/03/2024
Total gross income £9.44k £335 £500 £1.36k £0
Total expenditure £5.40k £0 £0 £0 £1.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 March 2024 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 11 March 2023 19 June 2024 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 11 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 11 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 11 March 2020 13 January 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Drybrook Surgery
Drybrook Road
Drybrook
GL17 9JE
Phone:
01594542239
Website:

No information available