TIDDLYWINKS PRE-SCHOOL (WEST BESSACARR)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School for children aged 2.5yrs-5yrs open 4 mornings per week term time only
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Doncaster
Governance
- 08 April 1993: Standard registration
- 12 January 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 12 January 2011: Funds transferred to 1138043 TIDDLYWINKS PRE-SCHOOL (BESSACARR) LTD
- WEST BESSACARR PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.39k | £24.10k | £17.65k | £27.18k | £23.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.77k | £18.60k | £19.80k | £24.21k | £25.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 11 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 11 June 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 23 December 2009 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 02 July 2009 | 2 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 16 September 2008 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 04 November 2008 | 127 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 28 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 28 February 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED 8 DECEMBER 1998.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVLOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FIR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window