FRIENDS OF WOOLSERY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various fund-raising activities to benefit the children of Woolsery Primary School to enhance their education & well being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 14 April 1993: Standard registration
- 09 April 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 April 2012: Re-registered
- 05 November 2015: Funds received from 1096000 SUNFLOWERS PRE-SCHOOL WOOLSERY
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faye Wood | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lizzie Nisbett | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louise Angela Shaw | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Clarke | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Banks | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Leigh | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Emma Olde | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Birmingham | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Smith | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Jane Moodie Allen | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil James WONNACOTT | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|||||
MR MATT COLE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.19k | £3.49k | £4.79k | £4.64k | £4.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.39k | £3.83k | £3.03k | £8.14k | £1.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 NOVEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woolsery Primary School
Woolsery
BIDEFORD
EX39 5QS
- Phone:
- 01237431307
- Email:
- admin@woolsery.devon.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window