Accounts and annual returns PUDDLEDUCKS PRE-SCHOOL SALISBURY

Charity number: 1019825
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 May 2024 327 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 May 2024 692 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 22 May 2024 692 days late
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 27 June 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On Time