Financial history PUDDLEDUCKS PRE-SCHOOL SALISBURY

Charity number: 1019825
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £162.13k £216.87k £166.13k £37 £4
Total expenditure £190.01k £169.36k £241.23k £2.08k £118
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £135.74k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £106.93k £187.01k N/A N/A N/A