Trustees CLIFTON NEIGHBOURHOOD CENTRE

Charity Number: 1019843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Hancock Chair 13 October 2014
None on record
Julie Kopicki Trustee 07 June 2023
None on record
Susan Speakman Trustee 09 September 2019
None on record
Angela Brooks Trustee 20 November 2017
None on record
SYLVIA BILLINGTON Trustee 20 February 2007
None on record
JAMES BROWN Trustee 25 February 2003
None on record
ALISON FORDHAM Trustee
None on record