FAMILY MATTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide therapeutic counselling to survivors of sexual abuse and rape in Kent and SE London including the provision of Independent Sexual Violence Adviser (ISVA) support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
Total income includes £465,290 from 2 government contract(s) and £525,535 from 4 government grant(s)
People

25 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
- Bromley
- Kent
- Medway
- Shropshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 13 April 1993: Standard registration
- FAMILY MATTERS (BREAKING THE CYCLE OF ABUSE) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernice Giggins | Chair | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Giggins | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Skye Kennedy-Cullen | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £478.98k | £746.54k | £705.61k | £974.07k | £1.04m | |
|
Total expenditure | £592.07k | £678.33k | £707.66k | £791.65k | £907.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £561.97k | £336.83k | £449.11k | £465.29k | |
|
Income from government grants | £269.00k | £98.45k | £335.85k | £485.18k | £525.54k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £16.24k | £11.78k | £15.13k | £26.75k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £712.59k | £21.13k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £43 | £19 | £0 | £266 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £17.67k | £0 | £24.66k | £21.95k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £675.05k | £704.63k | £788.50k | £903.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £3.29k | £3.03k | £3.16k | £4.48k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £3.67k | £2.46k | £1.65k | £1.11k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £206.53k | £207.87k | £393.17k | £524.09k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £18.73k | £20.91k | £22.98k | £21.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 72 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 72 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 29 November 2022 | 274 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 29 November 2022 | 274 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/03/1993 AS AMENDED ON 21/03/1997 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2005 AS AMENDED ON 19/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL & PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN SURVIVORS OF SEXUAL ABUSE & OTHER RELATED ABUSE & THEIR FAMILIES & PARTNERS & TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF SEXUAL ABUSE & ITS EFFECT ON VICTIMS, WHETHER MEDICAL, SOCIAL OR PSYCHOLOGICAL.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Wrotham Road
Gravesend
Kent
DA11 0PA
- Phone:
- 01474536661
- Email:
- admin@familymattersuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window