Accounts and annual returns CROYDON MEALS AGENCY

Charity number: 1019895
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 06 June 2012 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 27 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 22 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required