Financial history CROYDON MEALS AGENCY

Charity number: 1019895
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £134.43k £134.72k £2.01k £0 £59
Total expenditure £131.60k £129.32k £2.43k £0 £210
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A