CROYDON MEALS AGENCY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a home delivery service of hot and frozen meals to residents of the London Borough of Croydon who have been referred by Croydon Social Services THIS SERVICE IS NO LONGER PROVIDED BY CROYDON MEALS AGENCY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 April 1993: Standard registration
- 13 June 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CROYDON MEALS-ON-WHEELS - M O W (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.43k | £134.72k | £2.01k | £0 | £59 | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.60k | £129.32k | £2.43k | £0 | £210 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 06 June 2012 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 27 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 22 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF MEALS AND SERVICES TO PEOPLE WHO ARE ELDERLY FRAIL ILL OR OTHERWISE IN NEED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window