VERONICA HOUSE PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Project provides support for women and children leaving domestic breakdown situations who reside at the Veronica House Refuge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 15 April 1993: Standard registration
- 29 November 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.92k | £6.63k | £2.14k | £80 | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.52k | £22.22k | £11.70k | £670 | £176 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 08 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 24 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 25 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 30 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JULY 1992
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS AMONGST MEN WOMEN AND/OR CHILDREN WHO HAVE BEEN INVOLVED IN DOMESTIC BREAKDOWN,PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF HOSTEL AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR SUCH MEN WOMEN AND OR CHILDREN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window