Financial history FRIENDS OF PENYFFORDD SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1019962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.09k £18.60k £9.53k £11.40k £18.04k
Total expenditure £3.24k £1.80k £14.61k £14.16k £19.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A