Financial history OXFORDSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity number: 1019967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £188.42k £111.36k £58.50k £155.33k £143.25k
Total expenditure £195.77k £125.84k £49.32k £164.54k £152.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A