THE UK VASCULITIS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for those suffering from vasculitis and their families by means of personal advice and counselling, through use of a telephone helpline, post and email; also by means of an open access website, printed material, a regular newsletter and through local support groups. Supporting academic and clinical research into improved diagnosis and treatment of vasculitis and into its causes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 April 1993: Standard registration
- 28 December 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 28 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1180473 VASCULITIS UK
- VASCULITIS UK (Working name)
- WEGENERS GRANULOMATOSIS SUPPORT GROUP (Working name)
- STUART STRANGE TRUST (Previous name)
- STUART STRANGE VASCULITIS TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.91k | £175.47k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.55k | £133.38k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 359 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/03/1993 AS AMENDED ON 20/06/1998 AS AMENDED ON 24/06/2000 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS FROM AND TO AID RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES OF WEGENERS GRANULOMATOSIS BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE. TO SUPPORT SUFFERERS OF WEGENERS GRANULOMATOSIS AND THEIR RELATIVES AND FRIENDS BY MEANS OF A SUPPORT GROUP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window