ST JOSEPH'S PRIMARY SCHOOL FAIRVIEW ROAD PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise money to provide extra resources for the children at the school. We do this via a number of small school and community events, eg summer and winter fairs, raffles, pig races, quiz nights etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Wirral
Governance
- 16 April 1993: Standard registration
- 09 June 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 February 2012: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janine Piercy | Chair | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura Dennett | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wentworth | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Taylor | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Eizdi Sheshpiri | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Mathieson | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Malkin | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY LYNCH | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
LIZ RYAN | Trustee | 21 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.21k | £5.39k | £2.27k | £9.92k | £8.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.70k | £3.70k | £1.56k | £11.33k | £15.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 September 2024 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 July 2021 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JULY 1987 AS AMENDED ON 24 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THEEDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS,
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Josephs RC Primary School
Woodchurch Road
PRENTON
CH43 5UT
- Phone:
- 01516526781
- Email:
- stjosephspta@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window