Trustees ST JOSEPH'S PRIMARY SCHOOL FAIRVIEW ROAD PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1020024

Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janine Piercy | Chair | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura Dennett | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wentworth | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Taylor | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Eizdi Sheshpiri | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Mathieson | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Malkin | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY LYNCH | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
LIZ RYAN | Trustee | 21 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.