Accounts and annual returns QUEST COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1020030
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 16 May 2007 105 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 20 February 2006 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 20 February 2006 20 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 05 April 2005 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 05 April 2005 64 days late