MCCABE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The McCabe Educational Trust is the charitable partner to McCabe Pilgrimages. We aim to give something back to the many inspiring people we meet on pilgrimage. We do this with practical financial support for childrens homes, schools for the blind, rehabilitation hospitals and similar projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Georgia
- India
- Israel
- Nepal
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Spain
Governance
- 20 April 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Spalding | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Webster | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
REVEREND ROSEMIA BROWN | Trustee | 12 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
MR STUART LYNCH | Trustee | 08 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev IAIN PATON | Trustee | 01 May 1988 |
|
|
||||||||
REV CANON IAIN FERGUSON PATON BD FCIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Rev KEVIN DUNNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
THE REV'D PREB DR BRIAN LEATHARD | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
VERY REV'D GEOFFREY OSBORNE MARSHALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.24k | £180.84k | £145.38k | £196.27k | £190.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £267.23k | £163.88k | £182.10k | £191.59k | £184.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 29 October 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 29 October 2023 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 AUGUST 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION THE 31ST OCTOBER 2000 AND 10TH MARCH 2008, NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18TH NOVEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION BY FURTHERING EDUCATION IN THE LANDS PILGRIMS VISIT AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN THESE AREAS
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Muldoanich
Stirling Street
Blackford
Auchterarder
PH4 1QG
- Phone:
- 01764682234
- Email:
- iain.f.paton@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window