EIRIS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is a financial & corporate system that encourages sustainable & responsible wealth creation & management. Our mission is to use research, analysis and influence to help charities who want to invest responsibly or to influence other responsible investors in support of their missions, and to help other organisations & individuals contribute to the responsible business & investment agenda.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£701,239
Donations and legacies | £384.74k | |
Charitable activities | £233.62k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £14.29k | |
Other | £68.59k |
Total expenditure:
£887,329
Raising funds | £110.71k | |
Charitable activities | £776.62k | |
Other | £0 |
£10,072 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £110.71k | |
Charitable expenditure | £776.62k |
People

13 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 April 1993: Standard registration
- EIRIS (Previous name)
- ETHICAL INVESTMENT RESEARCH SERVICE (EIRIS) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Timothy Bent | Chair | 15 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Kong | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Nina Roth | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Matthew Walsh Hay | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Stuart Howitt | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Parke | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES WAY | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £480.50k | £468.97k | £241.66k | £402.57k | £701.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £560.82k | £582.03k | £472.52k | £728.21k | £887.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £384.74k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £233.62k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.29k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £68.59k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £776.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £110.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £53.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £33.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.65k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £975.30k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £442.68k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £107.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JANUARY 1990 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 23 MARCH 1993
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE SOCIAL AND ETHICAL ASPECTS OF COMMERCIAL AND INDUSTRIAL ACTIVITIES OF BUSINESSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS AND THE BEARING OF THESE ASPECTS ON INVESTMENT POLICIES AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH B) TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE IN DIRECT PURSUIT OF THEIR OBJECTS THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF A) CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND TAKING EFFECT WITHIN THE UK AND B) CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED WITHIN THE UK AND TAKING EFFECT OUTSIDE THE UK THE OBJECTS OF WHICH ARE CONFINED TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR SICKNESS OR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIGION BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON THE ACTIVITIES AND INVESTMENT POLICIES OF COMMERCIAL ORGANISATIONS TO ENABLE THE CHARITIES TO MAKE AN INFORMED CHOICE OF INVESTMENTS WHICH WOULD NOT CONFLICT WITH THE AIMS OF THE CHARITY OR OTHERWISE HAMPER THE CHARITY'S WORK
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Foundry
17 Oval Way
LONDON
SE11 5RR
- Phone:
- 02037525754
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window