CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Community Ministries looks to serve the needy in a practical, caring way, whilst seeking to show the love of Jesus Christ and to share his gospel of repentance, reconciliation and forgiveness to God the Father. CCM currently supports childrens' homes and churches in Romania, Thailand and India and delivers aid to Romania and Israel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire West & Chester
- India
- Mozambique
- Romania
- Thailand
Governance
- 22 April 1993: Standard registration
- 06 February 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 06 February 2017: Funds transferred to 1051803 BARNTON PENTECOSTAL CHURCH
- C C M (Working name)
- CCM INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.03k | £73.52k | £76.89k | £92.50k | £79.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.35k | £134.25k | £82.33k | £70.92k | £94.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 22 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 22 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 26 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 26 September 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 24 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 14 October 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 JUNE 1992 TRUST DEED DATED 21/06/1992 AS AMENDED ON 28/02/2015
Charitable objects
A.TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD B.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window