IMPERIAL CHARITY PROMOTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising shows, trips and activities for the elderly and adults and children with special needs. We also provide free entertainment to Residential Care and Nursing Homes when requested. Grants are made to Special Needs Schools in Wiltshire to support their activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 22 April 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Arthur Leslie Knight | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Grover | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Alexander Knight | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Stanley Norris | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie-Anne Cox | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.89k | £169.49k | £200.06k | £218.17k | £244.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £206.12k | £147.57k | £189.91k | £198.18k | £253.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.32k | £19.39k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/03/1993 AS AMENDED ON 03/11/2014
Charitable objects
SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN AS THE COMMITTEE OF THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Imperial Charity
27 Warminster Road
WESTBURY
Wiltshire
BA13 3PD
- Phone:
- 01373826826
- Email:
- info@imperialcharity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window