Trustees LONDON PETROPHYSICAL SOCIETY
Charity Number: 1020083

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alina Khmelevskaya | Chair | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
LUMBAN IRVAN PARDEDE | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gabe Lauderdale-Smith | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Towers Mynors | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arathi Lakshmi Narasimhan Mahesh | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sherif Farag | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Tallon | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Gibbons | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
JACK WILLIS | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN DRAPER | Trustee | 14 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.