Accounts and annual returns THE JUBILEE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1020084
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2022 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 February 2020 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required