Trustees KING'S BROMLEY UNITED CHARITY

Charity number: 1020119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DENNIS DAVID O'DEA Chair 01 September 2015
None on record
Rev Jeremy Brading Trustee 12 October 2021
THE RICHARD CROSSE SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KEVIN PRICE Trustee 13 April 2018
None on record
ROGER PRICE Trustee 19 October 2016
None on record
DAVID CROCKETT Trustee 19 August 2015
None on record
PATRICIA ROTHERY Trustee 18 March 2013
None on record