CLACKCLOSE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Childrens Pre School for ages 2 years to School Age. Providing a safe and happy environment for children Monday to Fridays from 9.00am to 3:00pm. Fully qualified members of staff with training support children through play with fun and learning in a relaxed environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £112,430 from 1 government contract(s) and £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 April 1993: Standard registration
- CLACKCLOSE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Whitehead | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Brown | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Seals | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.15k | £156.36k | £179.75k | £169.05k | £172.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.38k | £144.11k | £152.66k | £161.24k | £189.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £112.43k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.37k | N/A | £1.00k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 March 2025 | 248 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 March 2025 | 248 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 September 2023 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 September 2023 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 September 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 September 2022 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 October 2020 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 October 2020 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/10/1992 AS AMENDED ON 25/06/2015 as amended on 02 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLACKCLOSE SCHOOL
Downham Market Children's Centre
Snape Lane
Paradise Road
Downham Market
Norfolk
- Phone:
- 01366385067
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window