MANOR ROAD PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sessional Pre-school 9 till 3.30 every week day , term time only. Full day care is available. Children are aged 2 years 9 months until 4 years 10 months.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
Total income includes £39,005 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 23 April 1993: Standard registration
- 11 May 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- MANOR ROAD PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- MANOR ROAD PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.74k | £131.32k | £85.59k | £74.39k | £45.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.69k | £114.81k | £85.59k | £73.38k | £43.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £110.85k | £99.77k | £55.00k | £66.14k | £39.01k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 03 February 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 07 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 07 February 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 APRIL 1989
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window