Financial history TEES VALLEY YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1020171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £923.31k £660.11k £627.04k £716.38k £793.12k
Total expenditure £902.25k £690.97k £623.05k £687.40k £759.43k
Income from government contracts £263.08k £270.14k £270.14k £328.88k £328.64k
Income from government grants N/A £36.93k £36.93k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £10.00k £1.41k £2.22k £6.98k £5.46k
Income - Other trading activities £26.02k £9.47k £12.60k £0 £32.83k
Income - Charitable activities £887.29k £649.23k £612.22k £675.49k £752.15k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.67k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £33.91k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.46k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £902.25k £690.97k £623.05k £687.40k £759.43k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £1.50k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0