Care Rights UK: your care champion

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Care Rights UK is your care champion, the charity focused on promoting the rights of people in care. We want people to know their rights and how to use them. We offer information, advice and support to empower people using care services, and their relatives and friends. As a community of families and experts, we challenge poor, highlight good practice and demand a better system.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 April 1993: Standard registration
- Care Rights UK (Working name)
- THE RELATIVES AND RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE RELATIVES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE RELATIVES ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA DAVIES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Duncan Edward Lugton | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Anne Graham | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Louise Williamson | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Alleyn | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Quentin Storey | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Malcolm Hawes | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.52k | £119.07k | £141.94k | £175.12k | £136.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £167.67k | £204.55k | £230.38k | £276.56k | £337.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £29.92k | £23.54k | £28.80k | £28.80k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31 MAR 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 DEC 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 NOV 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 NOV 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 FEB 2016 as amended on 15 May 2023
Charitable objects
(I)TO ALLEVIATE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONGST ELDERLY PEOPLE BY ANY MEANS CONSIDERED NECESSARY FROM TIME TO TIME AND DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE. (II)TO ALLEVIATE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AMONG PEOPLE(INCLUDING RELATIVES) WHO ARE CARING OR WHO HAVE CARED FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE AND WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, AND OF THE DEPENDENTS OF SUCH CARERS BEING DEPENDENTS WHO ARE THEMSELVES IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, AND FOR THAT REASON TO PROMOTE THE MATERIAL WELFARE OF SUCH CARERS AS AFORESAID. (III)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND COUNSELLING AND THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION TO ELDERLY PEOPLE AND TO PERSONS(INCLUDING RELATIVES) CARING FOR OR HAVING CARERS FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE. (IV)TO ASSIST IN ACHIEVING AND MAINTAINING THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARDS OF CARE FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE RESIDENT IN RESIDENTIAL CARE HOMES, NURSING HOMES, HOMES WITH DUAL REGISTRATION, LONG STAY HOSPITALS OR OTHER HOMES FOR THE CARE OF ELDERLY PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 6
Aztec Row
1 Berners Road
London
- Phone:
- 02073598148
- Email:
- team@carerightsuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window