STENSON FIELDS PRIMARY COMMUNITY SCHOOL PARENTS'ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1020200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

School Fayres,bingo nights, quiz nights, film nights, donations made to school

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £23
Total expenditure: £3,504

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 April 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ladislava Barochova Trustee 15 December 2019
None on record
Karenjit Kaur Takhar Trustee 30 September 2017
None on record
Harmeet Kaur Atwal Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.49k £808 £1.66k £20 £23
Total expenditure £1.33k £574 £11.66k £2.08k £3.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 March 2022 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 April 2021 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Stenson Fields Primary Community Sc
Goathland Road
Stenson Fields
DERBY
DE24 3BW
Phone:
01332772452
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available