SOUTH WOODHAM PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
pre school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 30 April 1993: Standard registration
- SOUTH WOODHAM VILLAGE HALL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN BOWYER | Chair | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Edmunds-Schuller | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jade Watson | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Basaras | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Piper | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Watkins | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.03k | £142.18k | £159.48k | £157.29k | £170.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.47k | £131.15k | £146.71k | £149.58k | £174.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £90.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 August 2024 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 August 2024 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 133 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 March 2022 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 March 2022 | 244 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 July 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 July 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MAY 1992 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Woodham Preschool
C/O Woodville Primary School
Brent Avenue
South Woodham Ferrers
Essex
CM3 5SE
- Phone:
- 01245 425746
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window