THORPE CAMP PRESERVATION GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Visitor Centre depicting the history of RAF Woodhall Spa and its Squadrons and civilian life in Lincolnshire during World War II for the bensfit of the general public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 27 April 1993: Standard registration
- 08 January 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 January 2014: Funds transferred to 1154931 THORPE CAMP PRESERVATION GROUP LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.04k | £21.08k | £23.61k | £22.94k | £23.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.24k | £15.72k | £19.19k | £20.91k | £37.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 05 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 12 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 17 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 MARCH 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM DEPICTING THE STORY OF ROYAL AIR FORCE WOODHALL SPA AND ITS SQUADRONS AND OF CIVILIAN LIFE IN LINCOLNSHIRE DURING WORLD WAR 11
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window