Families of Liss Schools PTA (FLIS PTA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PTA holds a variety of fundraising events for children and families, including Easter and Autumn fairs and quiz Nights etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 28 April 1993: Standard registration
- 04 April 2024: Funds received from 1052767 LISS COUNTY JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATI...
- LISS COUNTY INFANT SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Fazey | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Hargreaves | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Wetherall | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.82k | £1.38k | £418 | £779 | £10.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.17k | £1.67k | £1.96k | £1.59k | £2.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 July 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MARCH 1993 as amended on 18 Oct 2023 as amended on 18 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
2. PURPOSES The object of the association (the objects) is to advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: 2.1 Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school 2.2 Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Families of Liss Schools PTA
LISS INFANT SCHOOL
HILL BROW ROAD
LISS
GU33 7LQ
- Phone:
- 01730 892666
- Email:
- flispta@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window