PIX PRE-SCHOOL GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide care and education to pre-school children between the ages of 2 and four years old. We believe children learn best by playing and having fun within a safe and secure environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 27 April 1993: Standard registration
- 09 July 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PIX PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.07k | £48.47k | £42.55k | £41.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.12k | £46.60k | £43.53k | £44.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 08 May 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 13 May 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 22 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 22 June 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 20 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 07 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 10 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 10 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JANUARY 1990 AS AMENDED 12 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE LETCHWORTH AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window