SANCTUARY TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 1020295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of Poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £104,140
Total expenditure: £2,014,030

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Conwy
  • Denbighshire
  • Flintshire
  • Gwynedd
  • Isle Of Anglesey
  • Lancashire
  • Manchester City
  • Wrexham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 April 1993: Standard registration
  • 26 March 2019: Funds received from 1097082 BETHEL CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ernest Michael Fowler Trustee 15 January 2024
OPERATION HOPE
Received: On time
Christopher Cowan Trustee 15 January 2024
None on record
Sarah Riding Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
JOHN EDWARDS Trustee 05 August 2019
OAZA UK
Received: On time
THE CAERNARFON PENTECOSTAL CHURCH
Received: 3 days late
Rev CARL RYAN MCCANN MA. BA. TH Trustee 19 February 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.06m £1.48m £1.61m £1.73m £2.00m
Total expenditure £1.03m £1.45m £1.66m £1.96m £2.01m
Income from government contracts £294.96k £678.01k £742.04k £734.77k £879.22k
Income from government grants N/A £30.22k £42.15k £25.50k £36.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £44.08k £61.63k £81.73k £74.12k £48.03k
Income - Other trading activities £69.50k £0 £69.49k £0 £53.39k
Income - Charitable activities £942.63k £39.10k £1.46m £1.60m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £898 £180 £48 £646 £2.72k
Income - Other £0 £1.38m £0 £61.62k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £25.79k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £953.85k £1.40m £1.60m £1.90m £2.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £73.44k £48.63k £59.23k £63.81k £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.06k £8.17k £8.45k £0 £24.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £255.72k £251.18k £252.23k £260.94k £242.39k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £486.36k £510.30k £498.34k £237.45k £267.67k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £88.27k £76.26k £117.82k £96.33k £121.62k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 February 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 20 February 2023 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 30 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Sanctuary Trust
Globe House Business Centre
Globe Park
Moss Bridge Road
ROCHDALE
Lancashi
Phone:
01706 526722